Financial history GREAT YARMOUTH COLLEGE STUDENT CHAPLAINCY PROJECT

Charity Number: 1061826
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £3.77k £3.50k £4.35k £2.98k £2.45k
Total expenditure £4.39k £1.86k £3.81k £0 £6.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A