Financial history POPULATION SERVICES INTERNATIONAL/EUROPE

Charity number: 1064629
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 30/06/2009
Total gross income £1.57m £1.03m £879.47k £936.55k £395.25k
Total expenditure £1.54m £1.18m £933.57k £967.78k £446.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £928.99k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £7.08k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £480 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £787.67k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £32.05k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £148.06k N/A