HEAD TO HEAD TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide training and coaching for the unemployed, under priviledged, those starting up in buisness and self-employed individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 July 1997: Standard registration
- 21 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £700.26k | £494.55k | £384.14k | £334.55k | £238.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £701.37k | £493.68k | £374.31k | £325.56k | £230.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £700.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £695.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 13 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 13 August 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 25 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 25 September 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH OCTOBER 1993, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION INCORPORATED 3RD DECEMBER 1996 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 4TH JULY 1997
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OCCASIONED BY UNEMPLOYMENT OR OTHER CAUSES IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUBJECTS WHICH MAY IMPROVE THEIR PROSPECTS BY OBTAINING EMPLOYMENT OR ESTABLISHING THEIR OWN BUSINESSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window