Financial history BICKLEY PARK SCHOOL LTD

Charity number: 307915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.95m £5.02m £5.22m £5.35m £5.58m
Total expenditure £4.38m £4.34m £4.71m £5.15m £5.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £30.56k £34.97k £31.04k £41.80k £65.90k
Income - Charitable activities £4.92m £4.99m £5.19m £5.31m £5.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.15k £1.70k £89 £280 £8.98k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.36m £4.33m £4.70m £5.13m £5.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.15k £16.45k £11.24k £20.28k £16.82k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £11.38k £12.06k £0 £13.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0