UPPER STREET MULTICULTURAL COUNSELLING CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to prevent emotional and mental distress and promote inclusive dialogue and collaboration between individuals, couples, families and communities by providing low-cost and accessible counselling and psychotherapy services sensitive to the needs of people with mental health issues in conjunction with cultural difference, poverty, age, vulnerability and social disadvantage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Camden
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Greenwich
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 13 May 1997: Standard registration
- 23 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MULTICULTURAL COUNSELLING CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.28k | £9.41k | £2.13k | £6.40k | £3.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £6.70k | £3.83k | £4.50k | £6.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST JANUARY 1997 AND AMENDED 18TH APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS IN LONDON SUFFERING EMOTIONAL DISTRESS CAUSED BY ISSUES SUCH AS DISCRIMINATION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF COMMUNICATION AND THE BREAKUP OF RELATIONSHIPS BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window