CAT RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our cattery in south Essex provides care for abandoned, lost and injured cats until suitably rehomed. Our core ethics are a non-destruction policy. We are supported by volunteers and donors. We provide life care for ferals and cats that are unsuitable for rehoming. We provide veterinary treatment for cats in need and to ensure that each cat is neutered on arrival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Enfield
- Essex
- Hackney
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 15 May 1997: Standard registration
- CAT RESCUE (REDBRIDGE AND WALTHAM FOREST) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE BEECHAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Candida Doody | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BEECHAM | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Doody | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.05k | £3.28k | £16.45k | £4.75k | £97.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.79k | £13.65k | £13.23k | £15.19k | £21.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 2000 AND AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CATS AND KITTENS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL DECIDE INCLUDING (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) BY UNDERTAKING THE TEMPORARY SHELTERING OF CATS AND KITTENS PARTED FROM THEIR OWNERS PERMANENTLY; (B) BY MAINTAINING A SHELTER OR CENTRES FOR TREATING UNWANTED, SICK AND ILL-TREATED CATS AND KITTENS; (C) BY MAKING ARRANGEMENTS FOR THE ADOPTION OF AND RESPONSIBILITY FOR CATS AND KITTENS; (D) BY PAINLESSLY DESTROYING CATS FOLLOWING ADVICE FROM VETERINARY SURGEONS; (E) BY NEUTERING CATS FOLLOWING ADVICE FROM VETERINARY SURGEONS; (F) BY CO-OPERATING WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING A SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Carnanton Road
LONDON
E17 4DA
- Phone:
- 02085311691
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window