ST KITTS AND NEVIS FRIENDLY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth Club: A range of indoor sports and recreation activities such as boxing, pool, table tennis, laughter & fun, keep-fit and periodically discos Training/Boxing: Aimed @ young people aged 10 years and over Domino Club: This club meets at weekends and attracts families for social interaction. Exchange visits are made with other Domino clubs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
Governance
- 20 May 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Sealy | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter McKeown | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Ashley Wickham | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Xavier Miller | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gweneth Buncombe | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £8.29k | £8.33k | £10.38k | £14.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.82k | £8.88k | £6.46k | £11.19k | £13.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £700 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2023 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2023 | 730 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MAY 1997
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE NATIONALS OF ST. KITTS AND NEVIS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 LORETTO GARDENS
HARROW
HA3 9LY
- Phone:
- 02082049441
- Email:
- info@sknfa.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window