Financial history HILDEN OAKS SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 307935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.83m £1.94m £1.94m £2.15m £2.32m
Total expenditure £1.97m £1.89m £2.03m £2.18m £2.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £33.30k £0 £0 £517 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.94m £1.94m £2.15m £2.15m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £2.56k £5.75k
Income - Other £6.39k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.97m £1.89m £2.03m £2.17m £2.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £14.80k £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.96k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0