Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE DUKE OF YORK'S ROYAL MILITARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 307938
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 13 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 13 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 25 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 11 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 11 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 23 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 23 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 21 July 2004 On Time