Financial history ST AUGUSTINE'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £319.15k £301.61k £349.72k £232.18k £318.61k
Total expenditure £13.06k £222.25k £225.80k £360.13k £279.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A