THE DURNING LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Expenditure is used to assist school libraries and to fund extended hours at the Ascot Durning Library. Additional library hours funded at ?20,000 per annum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 07 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF DONOVAN | Chair | 16 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Sean Chamberlain Mr. | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Chamberlain | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew MARTIN DIXON | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|||||
CAROLYN AUTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.47k | £23.67k | £23.85k | £23.92k | £24.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.87k | £18.79k | £29.01k | £23.70k | £30.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 20TH JANUARY 1892; SCHEME DATED 16TH MARCH 1959 AND SCHEME DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2001 AS FURTHER AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 6 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST THE COUNTY COUNCIL IN PROVIDING A SUPERIOR LIBRARY SERVICE; THE PROVISION OF LIBRARY FACILITIES NOT PROVIDED STATUTORILY BY THE COUNTY COUNCIL; THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
ASCOT AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DURNING LIBRARY
HIGH STREET
ASCOT
BERKSHIRE
SL5 7JF
- Phone:
- 01344630140
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window