THE SIR STANLEY SPENCER MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trust is responsible for maintaining and managing an independent art gallery devoted to the work of one of Britain's greatest 20th Century artists Sir Stanley Spencer RA who was born in Cookham and set many of his paintings in the village. The gallery has over 100 paintings and drawings of the artist and is housed in the former Wesley Chapel where he worshipped with his mother.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 19 June 1961: Standard registration
- STANLEY SPENCER GALLERY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SCOT MCKENDRICK | Chair |
|
||||
Flora Katherine Astor | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|||
Christopher Niall Bridgmore Brown | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||
Andrew Stuart de Mille | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||
Peter Anthony Brown | Trustee | 09 June 2017 |
|
|||
Amanda Jane Petitgas | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.37k | £219.36k | £69.26k | £154.87k | £93.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.99k | £93.47k | £91.31k | £116.95k | £126.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.10k | £16.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH MAY 1961 AS AMENDED 8 JULY 2005 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2010 AND ORDER DATED 8 JULY 2005. as amended on 19 Nov 2018 as amended on 18 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE FOUNDATION AND SUPPORT OF AN ART GALLERY TO EXHIBIT PAINTINGS AND OTHER WORKS OF ART BY THE LATE SIR STANLEY SPENCER AND SUCH OTHER PAINTINGS AND WORKS OF ART HAVING AN EDUCATIONAL VALUE;OTHER EDUCATIONAL OBJECTS AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
COOKHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanley Spencer Gallery
High Street
Cookham
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 9SJ
- Phone:
- 01628 531092
- Email:
- info@stanleyspencer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window