LANE END SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout and Guide Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 November 1972: Standard registration
- 1ST LANE END SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- LANE END SCOUT AND GUIDES COUNCIL (Working name)
- LANE END SCOUTS (Working name)
- LANE END SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE MEAKES | Chair | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Harwood-Laye | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carole Marie Harris | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arnaud Gei-Wai Cheung | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Pightling | Trustee | 15 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.10k | £14.81k | £15.39k | £20.22k | £26.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.21k | £9.80k | £105.31k | £14.54k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED 19 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL SOCIALAND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDULAS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
LANE END
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Village School
Bullocks Farm Lane
Lane End
High Wycombe
Bucks
HP14 3NJ
- Phone:
- 07941387343
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window