COOPER'S HILL RECREATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides and assists in providing facilities and support for recreation and other leisure time occupation in or in connection with the urban district of Egham and it's neighborhood. This includes local sports clubs (football and tennis) and fitness instruction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 November 1972: Standard registration
- CHRT LTD (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Bradbury | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Wilson | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Tenconi | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Emmett | Trustee | 31 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Leon Turner | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
IAN BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.41k | £39.58k | £32.43k | £25.71k | £26.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.43k | £47.60k | £26.82k | £31.17k | £32.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.34k | £8.09k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH JULY 1972
Charitable objects
TO PROVIED OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SUB-PARAGRAPHS IF THIS UB-CLAUSE. (SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM FOR FURTHER DETAILS).
Area of benefit
EGHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Salisbury Close
WOKINGHAM
RG41 4AJ
- Phone:
- 07920038250
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window