THRIPLOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Physical and mental training, recreation and social, moral and intellectual development through the medium of reading and recreation rooms, library, lectures, classes, recreations, meetings and such activities as may be found expedient for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Thriplow in Cambridgeshire and its immediate vicinity without distinction of sex, politics or religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 08 January 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE ELISABETH NICOLA GOUGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN CORBET | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Luckham | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Diana Murch | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER IAIN CARLYLE JACKSON | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Patricia Joan EASTHOPE | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
AUSTIN FLYNN | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EASTHOPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SEAN ANTHONY MACGARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON MARIA MCGINTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £14.83k | £12.49k | £7.71k | £12.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.17k | £7.72k | £9.49k | £9.95k | £28.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 25 JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO CLAUSE 25 OF THE SCHEME THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THRIPLOW IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Lower Street
Thriplow
Royston
SG8 7RJ
- Phone:
- 01763208401
- Email:
- david@easthope.email
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window