BOZEAT PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing pavillion, and field, for the use of sporting, and other social activities, for the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 January 1973: Standard registration
- B P F A (Working name)
- THE BOZEAT PLAYING FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY LYALL | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
KATE DUDLEY-SMITH | Trustee | 11 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicholas Gibbins | Trustee | 08 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Nicholas Cooke | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GIBBINS | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.53k | £14.26k | £6.85k | £9.42k | £6.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £13.93k | £3.52k | £3.87k | £6.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH MAY 1971
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND OR PLAYING FIELD AND FACILITIES ANCILLARY THERETO AND IF THE COMMITTEE THINKS FIT A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BOZEAT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Clayland Close
Bozeat
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN29 7NT
- Phone:
- 07595955946
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window