Trustees TATWORTH PLAYING FIELDS
Charity number: 308115

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK JONATHAN CULVERWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SCOTT DAVIES | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean Bryan Johnson | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jo Andrews | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN ROWSON | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Diane Cox | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Arfon Evans | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paula Lillywhite | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin Lillywhite | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ERIC PEADON | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET GWYNN | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER ANDREW ALLAN | Trustee | 02 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM HAROLD OUSLEY | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JONES | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNA RUTH ALLEN | Trustee | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID ROWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNETTE MARGARET GOODY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW RISTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELISABETH ANNE AUSTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLADYS ELEANOR BETTY PRINCE | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBIN WILLIAM KINGSTON DANIELS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Kelly Foote | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE M JOSLIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENRY NICHOLAS FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.