HAINAULT FOREST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the benefits of the inhabitants of Hainault and the neighbourhood by associating with the local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,850 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redbridge
Governance
- 01 March 1973: Standard registration
- H F C A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA CRAY | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Frances Farrell | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Charles Lowe | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Rainey | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Morgan Trevor Jones | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Rainey | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raymond John Hardiman | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Helen Burton | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Frances Wing | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
gary papworth | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
jennifer hurley | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
leo heffernan | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £498.37k | £365.58k | £415.33k | £439.05k | £469.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502.61k | £398.17k | £448.00k | £456.44k | £473.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £27.89k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.64k | £178.31k | £52.69k | £27.89k | £26.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND OCTOBER 1972 AS AMENDED 23RD OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAINAULT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
HAINAULT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CENTRE
100B MANFORD WAY
CHIGWELL
ESSEX
IG7 4DF
- Phone:
- 02085004311
- Email:
- hfca100@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window