Financial history ASHFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 308138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.42k £44.30k £30.00k £65.05k £47.23k
Total expenditure £73.32k £37.14k £39.12k £89.27k £32.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A