6TH HASTINGS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A wide range of physical, interlectual, social and spiritual activities designed to help young people's personal development and to encourage them to play a full and active part in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 May 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CRONK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Edgesmith | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Bethany Cerys Olivia Marshall | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Roby | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harley James Marshall | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROGER CROUCH | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN STRACHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.12k | £3.48k | £842 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.31k | £3.29k | £2.31k | £0 | £473 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 December 2021 | 418 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
HASTINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Hughenden Road
HASTINGS
East Sussex
TN34 3TG
- Phone:
- 07966 530748
- Email:
- scouts@6thhastings.org.uk
- Website:
-
6thhastings.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window