Financial history NHS BLOOD AND TRANSPLANT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1061771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.77k £100.14k £67.24k £111.24k £62.15k
Total expenditure £71.52k £77.53k £120.43k £74.70k £9.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.80k N/A N/A N/A