THE CRESSET (PETERBOROUGH) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cresset is a multi-purpose community resource centre which offers a range of social and recreational facilties and services to the people of Bretton and Greater Peterborough in partnership with a range of other charities, social service providers, and the local authority. Commercial services are operated through our trading subsiduary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2014
Total income:
£2,072,166
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £366.83k | |
Other trading activities | £1.64m | |
Investments | £68.04k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,034,676
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £604.95k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.43m | |
Charitable expenditure | £604.95k | |
Retained for future use | £37.49k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 13 May 1973: Standard registration
- 23 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CRESSET LEISURE (TRADING CO) (Working name)
- CRESSET LEISURE SERVICES (TRADING CO) (Working name)
- THE CRESSET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £654.99k | £523.78k | £459.55k | £1.89m | £2.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £908.48k | £664.90k | £596.60k | £1.90m | £2.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £91.51k | £72.50k | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £1.49m | £1.64m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £362.84k | £338.61k | N/A | £337.20k | £366.83k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £43.13k | £42.10k | N/A | £60.22k | £68.04k | |
|
Income - Other | £157.51k | £70.57k | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £91.51k | £72.50k | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £902.18k | £658.48k | N/A | £557.89k | £604.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.30k | £6.42k | N/A | £6.47k | £4.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 30/06/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.66m | £2.64m | N/A | £2.65m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.06m | £1.06m | N/A | £1.06m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £266.50k | £253.07k | N/A | £220.36k | £2.39k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £523.82k | £634.07k | N/A | £673.07k | £2.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 07 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 16 June 2014 | 136 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 03 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 04 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 24 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 14 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 FEBRUARY 1987 AND 14 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN ORDER TO PRIMARILY IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF BRETTON TOWNSHIP AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF GREATER PETERBOROUGH, BUT SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE TO MEET THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED IN SUCH WAYS THAT ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window