4TH ITCHEN SOUTH (NETLEY) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 308216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sailing, Canoeing, Pulling and other waterbased activities Archery & Air rifle shooting Camping, Cycling, Fire lighting, & Cooking. Navigation on both Land and water

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £21,825
Total expenditure: £19,556

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Southampton City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1973: Standard registration
  • 09 July 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 12 December 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 4TH SOUTHAMPTON SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SJ Back Chair 05 August 2019
None on record
Christopher Alun Lowe Trustee 24 November 2023
None on record
Alexandra Diane Back Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
James Bonfield Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Simon Parry Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Abby Shacklock Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Tanith Stevie Vincent Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Alun Chorlton Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record
Deborah Sinclair Trustee 05 August 2019
None on record
Kevin Anthony Earl Trustee 12 December 2012
None on record
Janette Barfoot Trustee 01 July 1996
HAMPSHIRE CONSTABULARY WELFARE FUND
Received: On time
ITCHEN SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.21k £15.49k £7.17k £10.05k £21.83k
Total expenditure £7.54k £7.93k £11.74k £16.52k £19.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 March 2021 147 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4th Itchen South Netley Scout Hall
17, STATION ROAD
NETLEY ABBEY
SOUTHAMPTON
SO31 5DU
Phone:
02380456953