WOKING DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports Scout Groups and Explorer Scout Units and promotes Scouting in Woking, providing activities, meetings and a camp site to help young people aged 6 to 25 to achieve their full potential and become responsible citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
379 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 13 July 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Humphrey | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Philip Thompson | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Phillips | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicholas Carapiet | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Matthew Spencer | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MACKIE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER JOHN WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.07k | £92.64k | £128.28k | £121.19k | £131.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.40k | £78.54k | £109.57k | £116.23k | £122.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.08k | £40.43k | £24.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 186 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
WOKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Howards Road
WOKING
Surrey
GU22 9AP
- Phone:
- 07941783087
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window