LITTLE OWLS NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Owls Nursery provides a fun and caring environment for children aged between 2 - 5 in which they can flourish. It aims to maintain an excellent standard of childcare and prepare children for the transition to primary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 06 October 1973: Standard registration
- 01 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GREAT MILTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.06k | £83.75k | £67.68k | £62.54k | £56.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.89k | £67.50k | £73.68k | £71.47k | £58.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 01 February 2017 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2015
(These accounts |
01 February 2017 | 93 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 03 March 2016 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2014
(These accounts |
03 March 2016 | 124 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 17 February 2016 | 474 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 19 May 2015 | 200 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MAY 1970 AS AMENDED 29 APRIL 1996 AND 19 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION CLAUSE 2
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE (GREAT MILTON)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window