Trustees THE TAPLOW AND HITCHAM RECREATION GROUNDS ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 308328

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Barclay Cowper | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Nicholas Murray | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugo David Rooper Reeve | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louise Anne Symons | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Ormond | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sally Anne Ashford | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MICHAEL WAYLAND-SMITH | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.