BRADFORD HOSPITALS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY BRADFORD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 09 April 1997: Standard registration
- 29 April 2013: Funds received from 700720 BRADFORD HEALTH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
- BRADFORD HOSPITALS NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- BRADFORD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRADFORD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST THE BOARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £435.92k | £957.00k | £302.25k | £1.06m | £472.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £520.87k | £841.56k | £548.60k | £1.05m | £720.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £797.00k | N/A | £780.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £144.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £124.00k | N/A | £81.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £36.00k | N/A | £52.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £114.00k | N/A | £180.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £740.56k | N/A | £868.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £101.00k | N/A | £178.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £97.00k | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £4.51k | N/A | £5.81k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/3/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 26 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY BRADFORD TEACHING HOSPITALS NHS FOUNDATION TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRADFORD TEACHING HOSPITALS
FINANCE DEPARTMENT
DAISY BANK
DUCKWORTH LANE
BRADFORD
WEST YOR
- Phone:
- 01274273512
- Email:
- charity@bthft.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window