ROYAL DEVON UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises funds for Royal Devon University Healthcare NHS Foundation Trust to benefit both patients and staff over and above what is possible with NHS funding. We assist with the purchase of capital equipment and contributions towards capital schemes, patient welfare, staff training and development, staff welfare and medical research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,178,000
Donations and legacies | £1.67m | |
Charitable activities | £29.00k | |
Other trading activities | £302.00k | |
Investments | £174.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,130,000
Raising funds | £605.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.53m | |
Other | £0 |
£273,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,076 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £605.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.53m | |
Retained for future use | £48.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £605.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.53m | |
Retained for future use | £321.00k |
People

16 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 28 July 1997: Standard registration
- 27 March 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 1.RD&E CHARITY 2.OVER AND ABOVE (Working name)
- Royal Devon Hospitals Charity (Working name)
- 1.RD&E CHARITY 2.OVER AND ABOVE (Previous name)
- RD&E CHARITY (Previous name)
- RD&E CHARITY OVER AND ABOVE (Previous name)
- RD&E CHARITY - OVER AND ABOVE (Previous name)
- RD&E CHARITYOVER AND ABOVE (Previous name)
- RD&E CHARITYOVER AND ABOVE (Previous name)
- ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL CHARITY (Previous name)
- ROYAL DEVON UNIVERSITY HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sarah Elizabeth Lamb | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Harland | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy Cooper | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Samuel Higginson | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Marshall | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dame Shan Morgan | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Tony Neal | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brigid Kent | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Palmer | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Mills | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hibbard | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Foster | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Alastair Matthews | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Tidman | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADRIAN HARRIS | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Royal Devon University Healthcare NHS Foundation Trust | Trustee | 19 March 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77m | £861.00k | £870.00k | £3.63m | £2.18m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90m | £511.00k | £565.00k | £2.05m | £2.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.53k | £2.08k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.68m | £798.00k | £799.00k | £2.18m | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £230.00k | £302.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.00k | £29.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £83.00k | £63.00k | £71.00k | £98.00k | £174.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.11m | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £903.00k | £8.00k | £326.00k | £540.00k | £338.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.89m | £495.00k | £547.00k | £1.56m | £1.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.00k | £16.00k | £18.00k | £489.00k | £605.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.00k | £12.00k | £12.00k | £25.00k | £31.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.82m | £432.00k | £483.00k | £1.47m | £1.41m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £16.00k | £16.00k | £18.00k | £18.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.31m | £2.79m | £2.89m | £3.26m | £3.52m | |
|
Other assets | £1.63m | £576.00k | £898.00k | £2.12m | £2.84m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.47m | £52.00k | £49.00k | £244.00k | £887.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17/2/97 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 3 AUGUST 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 APR 2022
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL RESEARCH CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST DIAGNOSTICS DIRECTORATE CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL SERVICES DIRECTORATE
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MEDICAL DIRECTORATE CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST MEDICAL WARDS CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST ORTHOPAEDIC DIRECTORATE CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST ORTHOPAEDIC WARDS CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST PROFESSIONAL SERVICES CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST SURGERY ONE DIRECTORATE CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST SURGERY ONE WARDS CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST SURGERY TWO DIRECTORATE CHARITY
- THE ROYAL DEVON AND EXETER NHS FOUNDATION TRUST SURGERY TWO WARDS CHARITY
- 28 July 1997 : Standard registration
- 27 March 2018 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fundraising Office
Room E121
Royal Devon and Exeter Hospital
Barrack Road
Exeter
EX2 5DW
- Phone:
- 01392402040
- Email:
- rduh.charity@nhs.net
- Website:
-
royaldevoncharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window