HOMERTON HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply income for any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Services provided by Homerton University Hospital NHS Foundation Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 November 2002: Standard registration
- HOMERTON HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- HOMERTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE HOMERTON HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.00k | £373.00k | £542.00k | £228.00k | £224.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.00k | £206.00k | £204.00k | £304.00k | £649.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £525.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £17.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £203.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £63.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 27 MAY 2008 as amended on 29 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICE PROVIDED BY HOMERTON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 29 November 2002 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOMERTON HOSPITAL
HOMERTON ROW
LONDON
E9 6SR
- Phone:
- 020 8510 7320
- Email:
- huh-tr.homertonhope@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window