DANIEL PARSONS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1068492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education of persons under the age of 25 years who, or whose parents are resident in Dudley and the surrounding neighborourhood, have at any time attended at a school in the area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,319
Total expenditure: £5,662

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 March 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DANIEL PARSONS CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID FRANK HUGHES Chair
THE DUDLEY CHARITY
Received: On time
THE DUDLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF DUDLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE AUDREY HUDSON EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time
JOHN RICHARD BAIRD GRAHAM Trustee 13 March 2024
ROTARY CLUB OF DUDLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THOMAS PHILIP WESTLEY Trustee 14 January 2018
None on record
PETER MARSH Trustee 18 June 2016
THE MARY STEVENS HOSPICE
Received: On time
THE DUDLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BAYLIES' EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF DUDLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
KEN WEST Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.93k £15.80k £12.42k £15.97k £16.32k
Total expenditure £13.40k £9.59k £5.99k £17.62k £5.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
53 THE BROADWAY
DUDLEY
DY1 4AP
Phone:
01384259277
Website:

No information available