Financial history HEDDON ON THE WALL EDUCATION AND TRAINING TRUST

Charity Number: 1081477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/05/2020 14/05/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £807 £0 £255 £982
Total expenditure £16.12k £1.17k £11.06k £10.78k £10.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A