BURTERSETT VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burtersett Village Institute is a building in the centre of Burtersett next to the village green. The building can be hired for people to use as they wish, e.g. art displays, whist drives, childrens parties, etc. A village show is held annually to raise funds for the upkeep of the building. The building helps bring the community together as it is the only non-dwelling in the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 June 1999: Standard registration
- BURTERSETT VILLAGE INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Sikorska | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kath Ward | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lesley Edy | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Davies | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Davies | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Philip Lamb | Trustee | 29 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS PRATT | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.39k | £10.15k | £8.35k | £3.17k | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.01k | £897 | £941 | £7.93k | £7.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 28 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 January 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR (A) MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AN OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF BURTERSETT AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burtersett Institute
Burtersett
Nr Hawes
North Yorkshire
DL8 3PD
- Phone:
- 01969667913
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window