WOODLAND VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity Number: 1063591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Woodland Village Hall is used for various activities by the local community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £76,596
Total expenditure: £84,243

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WOODLAND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICIA ANN KINGSNORTH Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Louise Elizabeth Newton Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record
Brian Abbott Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.67k £11.51k £20.84k £84.24k £76.60k
Total expenditure £4.21k £1.76k £15.86k £76.60k £84.24k
Income from government contracts N/A £300 £300 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.73k £42.25k £70.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Village Hall
Woodland
BISHOP AUCKLAND
County Durham
DL13 5RH
Phone:
03007727781
Website:

No information available