FISHTOFT EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious/educational purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 June 1997: Standard registration
- TRUST PROPERTY FOR SITE OF OLD NATIONAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINCOLN DIOCESAN TRUST & BD FINANCE LTD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39 | £22 | £3 | £70 | £247 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME DATED 22 APRIL 1997
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE SCHEME
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LINCOLN
Contact information
- Address:
-
L D T AND B F LTD
CHURCH HOUSE
THE OLD PALACE
LINCOLN
LN2 1PU
- Phone:
- 01522504086
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window