MASJID E NOOR AND MADRESSAH ANWAROOL ISLAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Islam & Islamic Education, Provide a place for worship, Activities for recreation and social welfare in an Islamic ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 27 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
harun karolia | Chair | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hashim Bhana | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rafik Vardalia | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aadam Bulbulia | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Lorgat | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zubair Badat | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALIM HASAN JOGI | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.06k | £91.48k | £99.00k | £124.50k | £135.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.06k | £89.62k | £93.55k | £115.93k | £137.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2022
(These accounts |
26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 19TH MARCH 2006 as amended on 18 Feb 2022 as amended on 19 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ISLAMIC FAITH AS PRACTISED BY THE SUNNI MUSLIMS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE ACTIVITIES FOR RECREATION AND IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN THE BATLEY AREA OF WEST YORKSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR AMONGST THOSE YOUNG PERSONS AGED BETWEEN 5 AND 15 YEARS WHO ARE MUSLIMS AND TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE, BATLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID E NOOR & MADRESSA ANWAROOL ISLAM
90 DARK LANE
BATLEY
WF17 7RN
- Phone:
- 01924441474
- Email:
- masjidenoor123@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window