Trustees MASJID E NOOR AND MADRESSAH ANWAROOL ISLAM

Charity number: 1077956
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
harun karolia Chair 06 January 2024
None on record
Hashim Bhana Trustee 18 January 2025
None on record
Rafik Vardalia Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Aadam Bulbulia Trustee 19 February 2022
None on record
Mohammed Lorgat Trustee 19 February 2022
None on record
Zubair Badat Trustee 06 February 2016
None on record
SALIM HASAN JOGI Trustee 20 February 2015
None on record