Financial history ASHBY MAGNA VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1092271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.27k £1.93k £5.85k £11.92k £10.02k
Total expenditure £6.17k £6.21k £11.24k £10.47k £6.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A