Trustees ASHBY MAGNA VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1092271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Warren Dawson Chair 15 January 2015
None on record
Julie Smith Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Margaret Beck Trustee 11 January 2017
None on record
Duncan Scott Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
Valerie Dawson Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
Colin May Trustee 13 January 2016
None on record
ROBERT WITHERS Trustee
None on record
ALWYN JARROM Trustee
None on record
ARTHUR KENNEY Trustee
None on record