Financial history GURU NANAK GURDWARA SOUTH BIRMINGHAM

Charity number: 1107767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £240.39k £158.50k £303.36k £342.00k £519.84k
Total expenditure £197.85k £126.19k £212.60k £291.88k £353.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £483.85k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £35.54k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £458
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £92.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £226.26k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £81.91k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.32k