Financial history CRIDLING STUBBS EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1087128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £1.70k £1.33k £1.37k £1.73k £2.70k
Total expenditure £2.06k £2.01k £2.01k £2.50k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A