THE HEAGE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Ambergate Primary School. Supporting Heage Primary School. Advancing education of pupils and former pupils of those schools. Promoting education in Ripley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 May 1998: Standard registration
- 22 May 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 22 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1039485 DERBYSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.75k | £25.23k | £15.78k | £24.17k | £24.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.57k | £25.60k | £53.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 20 OCTOBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE AMBERGATE PRIMARY SCHOOL AND THE HEAGE PRIMARY SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEE AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOLS; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE SAID WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS; AND TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF OTHER PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF RIPLEY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RIPLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window