THE ROYAL MERCHANT NAVY SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support British children of Merchant Navy personnel by assessing their family circumstances and educational needs and providing help accordingly. Each applicant has unique problems and is treated individually. We can help at all educational stages, including University, and also for career and personal development training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 October 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY ANN ROBINSON | Chair | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linda Cotton | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||||
COMMODORE WILLIAM MICHAEL WALWORTH CBE | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
EMMA MCKENDRICK BA | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Simon Nicholas Cooper DL | Trustee | 04 February 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
Commodore The Honourable Michael Charles Nicholas Cochrane | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr RODNEY OWEN-JONES | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 March 2022 | 616 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 6TH DECEMBER 1980 & AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 9TH OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 AUGUST 2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FOUNDATION IS TO AFFORD CHARITABLE BENEFIT AND RELIEF TO FOUNDATIONERS BY PROVIDING FOR OR TOWARDS THEIR MAINTENANCE AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND MORALITY AND BY ASSISTING THEM IN TRAINING FOR AND TAKING UP EMPLOYMENT. PROVIDED THAT: “FOUNDATIONERS” MEANS THE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED AND ARE THE NATURAL OR ADOPTED CHILDREN OR OTHER LEGAL DEPENDENTS OF A PERSON WHO HAS SERVED OR IS SERVING AT SEA IN THE MERCHANT NAVY OR FISHING FLEET OR THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION PROVIDED THAT PRIORITY MAY BE GIVEN TO FOUNDATIONERS WHO ARE BRITISH OR HAVE AT LEAST ONE BRITISH PARENT. A PERSON “SERVING AT SEA IN THE MERCHANT NAVY” MEANS ANY SEAFARER WORKING IN ANY CAPACITY ABOARD A MERCHANT VESSEL WHICH INCLUDES BUT IS NOT LIMITED TO PASSENGER LINERS, FERRIES, CONTAINER SHIPS, TANKERS, BULK CARRIERS, BREAK BULK AND REFRIGERATED CARGO SHIPS, ROYAL FLEET AUXILIARIES (OR THEIR EQUIVALENT), COASTERS, SPECIALIST SHIPS (EG RNLI LIFEBOATS, DEEP SEA TUGS, SALVAGE VESSELS, OIL SUPPORT VESSELS, LIGHTHOUSE TENDERS ETC), LUXURY OR CHARTER YACHTS. A PERSON SERVING AT SEA IN THE “FISHING FLEET” MEANS ANY SEAFARER WORKING IN ANY CAPACITY ABOARD INSHORE OR DEEP SEA FISHING VESSELS. A PERSON “SERVING AT SEA IN THE ROYAL NATIONAL LIFEBOAT INSTITUTION” MEANS ANY CREW-MEMBER OF A LIFEBOAT OPERATED BY THIS INSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Charnham Lane
Hungerford
BERKSHIRE
RG17 0EY
- Phone:
- 01488567890
- Email:
- office@rmnef.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window