Financial history ST GEORGE'S SCHOOL ASCOT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 309088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.47m £6.21m £6.76m £7.93m £8.50m
Total expenditure £6.50m £6.22m £6.65m £7.30m £7.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £218.96k £159.14k £7.14k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.95k £16.38k £700 £10.18k £112.62k
Income - Other trading activities £84.08k £0 £151.27k £267.11k £418.00k
Income - Charitable activities £6.14m £6.20m £6.60m £7.65m £7.87m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.46k £0 £8.86k £0 £105.60k
Income - Other £225.36k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.33m £6.22m £6.65m £7.30m £7.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £173.70k £0 £0 £0 £256.39k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.90k £19.85k £0 £49.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0