Financial history ST ANDREW'S COLLEGE, BRADFIELD

Charity number: 309089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £28.06m £28.92m £44.61m £42.90m £45.97m
Total expenditure £29.31m £30.00m £39.09m £43.44m £46.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £607.27k N/A N/A £9.26k
Income - Donations and legacies £617.16k £568.38k £10.38m £967.00k £624.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.34m £1.09m £2.43m £3.25m £3.38m
Income - Charitable activities £24.72m £25.87m £33.32m £37.92m £41.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £184.13k £635.40k £561.00k £761.00k £850.00k
Income - Other £1.20m £753.13k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.04m £26.78m £35.90m £39.62m £41.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.27m £3.23m £3.19m £3.82m £4.53m
Expenditure - Governance £289.47k £392.26k £539.00k £287.00k £182.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0