Accounts and annual returns THE BANBURY BLUE COAT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 309191
Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1187 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1552 days