THE HOPE FFENNELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide education grants to young people in Wytham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 October 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR K F DAY | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Katherine Ann Tuckett | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Nigel Fisher | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS A DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR A CRESSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUIS LETOURNEAU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.24k | £7.26k | £7.42k | £7.22k | £7.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.68k | £8.60k | £8.46k | £14.77k | £11.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 11TH JUNE 1973
Charitable objects
IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, WHO ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WYTHAM OR IN THE WYTHAM ESTATE OWNED BY THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD OR IN THE PARISH OFNORTH HINSKEY, PREFENCE BEING GIVEN WHERE OTHER QUALIFICAIONS ARE EQUAL TO PERSONS IN THE PARISH OF WYTHAM OR THE WYTHAM ESTATE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WYTHAM AND NORTH HINKSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH END
WYTHAM ABBEY
WYTHAM
OXON
OX2 8QE
- Phone:
- 01865203475
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window