BAMPTON EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsibility for the running of a listed building used partly as a public library and as the village historial archive and to provide grants for the education of those under the age of 25years in need of assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Theresa Ball | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Newland | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Darke | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Baldwin | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev JANICE COLLIER | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Donald Rouse MBE | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Long | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS M DOWDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.55k | £5.09k | £25 | £6.68k | £7.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £4.00k | £82.03k | £5.72k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME MADE 8TH OCTOBER 1906, AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED 29TH AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
AFTER PAYMENT OF ANY EXPENSES OF ADMINISTRATION, THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Torvia
Bridge Street
BAMPTON
Oxfordshire
OX18 2HA
- Phone:
- 01993851066
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window