THE EWELME EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for educational purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Hampshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 08 November 1962: Standard registration
- EWELME EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH MAINE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gordon Ross | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Rosen | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Settle | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||
SUSAN KOSTER | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lady SARAH BACKHOUSE | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gail Christiana West | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Sue Lyons | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.72k | £270.00k | £270.01k | £270.01k | £200.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £277.02k | £235.33k | £239.38k | £278.71k | £159.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES DATED 8 AUGUST 1899, 31 JANUARY 1930 AND 14 MARCH 1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 8 AUGUST 1986 AND 25 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES. B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS. C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING. D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF EWELME
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 ST GILES
OXFORD
OX1 3LE
- Phone:
- 07585 628468
- Email:
- ewelme.exhibition@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window