Linked charities SOUTH BANK UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 309251
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 06/07/1923 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 13/01/1984 AND 26/11/1985
Charitable objects
TO MAKE PROVISION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE FOUNDATION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO AID THE HIGHER EDUCATION OF STUDENTS OF THE POLYTECHNIC OF THE SOUTH BANK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 09 October 1984 : Standard registration
  • 22 March 2000 : Removed