BISHOP BURGESS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education within parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 February 1964: Standard registration
- 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 October 2012: Re-registered
- 11 August 2016: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- LAVERSTOCK-BISHOP BURGESS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £417 | £466 | £463 | £441 | £449 | |
|
Total expenditure | £24 | £50 | £34 | £62 | £64 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 07 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 03 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 13 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 24 February 2014 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7THE SEPTEMBER 1931 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 27TH OCTOBER 1952
Charitable objects
1. TO APPLY INCOME TOWARDS THE COST OF ALTERATIONS AND REPAIRS TO THE PREMISES OF THE LAVERSTOCK CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL. 2. OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF POOR BOYS AND GIRLS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISHES OF LAVERSTOCK AND MILFORD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window